This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 09:32:31 (UTC).

NEXT OF KIN OF, ET. AL. V. HOMESTEAD OF HUGO, L.L.C., ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 NEXT OF KIN OF filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOMESTEAD OF HUGO, L L C . This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBERRY, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0040

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DEBERRY, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HIGGINBOTTOM, EMMA

NEXT OF KIN OF

MARTIN, THOMAS DWAIN

Defendants

HOMESTEAD OF HUGO, L.L.C.

TRADE NAME FOR

CITY OF HUGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SLAMA, JO L.

Attorney at SLAMA LEGAL GROUP / SUITE 100

4301 Southwest Third Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73108

BOROCHCHOFF, GIBBS ARMSTRONG,P.C.

601 South Boulder Avenue Suite 500

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED X2

10/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED X2

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT CITY OF HUGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SPECIAL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SPECIAL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESPONSE TO PLAIN 'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED X2; Amount: $ 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less