This case was last updated from Muskogee County Courts on 05/28/2022 at 02:01:04 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC DBA V. JOHN DOE, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 NEWREZ LLC DBA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOHN DOE. This case was filed in Muskogee County Courts, Muskogee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KING, TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0217

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Muskogee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KING, TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWREZ LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT

NEWREZ LLC DBA

Defendants

MCNATT, LOLA J.

MCNATT, JERRY LEE

MCNATT, KATHRYN D.

DOE, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LOGS LEGAL GROUP LLP

Attorney at LOGS LEGAL GROUP LLP

770 Ne 63Rd Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

08/31/2021: FILE & ENTER PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER

08/31/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER

08/31/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER

08/31/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER

08/31/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER

08/31/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE

10/13/2021: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE

RETURN OF NON SERVICE

10/13/2021: RETURN OF NON SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

10/13/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PUBLICATION NOTICE

10/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PUBLICATION NOTICE

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

10/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

10/22/2021: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

FIRST AMENDED PETITION

12/16/2021: FIRST AMENDED PETITION

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PUBLICATION NOTICE

12/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PUBLICATION NOTICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

05/05/2022: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION $194.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PUBLICATION NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FIRST AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION $192.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER TO PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less