This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 04/09/2022 at 03:15:24 (UTC).

Newby, Randell et al v. Steely, Drucella et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 Newby, Randell filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Steely, Drucella. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Corley, Phillip C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-288

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Corley, Phillip C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Newby, Natalie

Newby, Randell

Defendants

Olive, Lonnie Ray

Steely, Drucella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Davis, Kathern Renee'

Attorney at Kivell, Rayment and Francis

7666 East 61St Street, Triad Center Suite 550

Tulsa, OK 74133

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR QUIET TITLE

06/07/2018: PETITION FOR QUIET TITLE

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

06/07/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

06/07/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

06/07/2018: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

06/07/2018: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

07/03/2018: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND/OR NON-MAILING

07/03/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND/OR NON-MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED/LONNIE RAY OLIVER NOT SERVED, MOVED, LEFT NO FORWARDING ADDRESS/6-20-2018/PPS

07/03/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED/LONNIE RAY OLIVER NOT SERVED, MOVED, LEFT NO FORWARDING ADDRESS/6-20-2018/PPS

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED/DRUCELLA STEELY NOT SERVED, DECEASED AS OF 10-12-2011/PPS

07/03/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED/DRUCELLA STEELY NOT SERVED, DECEASED AS OF 10-12-2011/PPS

AMENDED PETITION

07/03/2018: AMENDED PETITION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/30/2018: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (JUDGE KISTLER)

08/17/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (JUDGE KISTLER)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL JUDGMENT; Judge; Party Details; Plaintiff: Newby, Randell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JE; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (JUDGE KISTLER); Party: Newby, Randell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION; Party: Newby, Randell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AMP; Description: AMENDED PETITION; Party: Newby, Randell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMU; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED/DRUCELLA STEELY NOT SERVED, DECEASED AS OF 10-12-2011/PPS; Party: Steely, Drucella

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMU; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED/LONNIE RAY OLIVER NOT SERVED, MOVED, LEFT NO FORWARDING ADDRESS/6-20-2018/PPS; Party: Olive, Lonnie Ray

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND/OR NON-MAILING; Party: Newby, Randell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE BY PUBLICATION; Party: Newby, Randell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-575091 ON 06/07/2018. PAYOR: KIVELL, RAYMENT AND FRANCIS, PC FOR NEWBY, RANDELL TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 174.14. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2018-288: $105.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2018-288: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CJ-2018-288: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-288: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2018-288: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-288: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CJ-2018-288: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2018-288: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-288: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-288: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CJ-2018-288: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE CORLEY, PHILLIP C. TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR QUIET TITLE; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: QUIET; Description: QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: QUIET TITLE(QUIET); Filed By: Newby, Randell

    Read MoreRead Less