This case was last updated from Logan County Courts on 05/22/2022 at 06:42:33 (UTC).

Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc v. Gibbs Construction, Inc

Case Summary

On 08/17/2018 Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gibbs Construction, Inc. This case was filed in Logan County Courts, Logan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Worthington, Susan C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-421

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Logan, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Worthington, Susan C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc

Defendant

Gibbs Construction, Inc

Garnishee

Bancfirst

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Klein, Bruce F.

222 N.W. 13Th St., Bruce@Bfkleinlaw.Com

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Defendant Attorney

Lee, Jon T.

Jtlee@Edmondlawoffice.Com, 1300 E. 9Th Street, Unit 1

Edmond, OK 73034

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/31/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

06/07/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

MINUTE ORDERS

11/01/2018: MINUTE ORDERS

AFFIDAVIT / ORDER ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON GIBBS CONSTRUCTION INC

08/17/2018: AFFIDAVIT / ORDER ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON GIBBS CONSTRUCTION INC

NOTICE OF HEARING / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/10/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ORDER OF THE COURT - 2CC

03/23/2020: ORDER OF THE COURT - 2CC

PLAIN , NED DETWILER CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S MOTION TO ASSESS PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST AGAINST DEFENDANT, GIBBS CONSTRUCTION, INC. AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

04/24/2020: PLAIN , NED DETWILER CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S MOTION TO ASSESS PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST AGAINST DEFENDANT, GIBBS CONSTRUCTION, INC. AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

POST-JUDGMENT GENERAL GARNISHMENT SUMMONS/NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT AND EXEMPTIONS/CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING/GENERAL GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE TO BANCFIRST

03/30/2020: POST-JUDGMENT GENERAL GARNISHMENT SUMMONS/NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT AND EXEMPTIONS/CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING/GENERAL GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE TO BANCFIRST

DEFENDANT, GIBBS CONSTRUCTION'S COMBINED RESPONSE TO PLAIN 'S MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AND MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

06/16/2020: DEFENDANT, GIBBS CONSTRUCTION'S COMBINED RESPONSE TO PLAIN 'S MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AND MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: NON-CONTINUING AND GENERAL GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT / = $6364.69 UNPROTECTED FUNDS; Party: Bancfirst

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-277680 ON 07/19/2021. PAYOR: BRUCE F KLEIN, PLLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 76.64. LINE ITEMS: SC-2018-421: $33.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES FOR NED DETWILER CONSTRUCTION, INC. SC-2018-421: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND FOR NED DETWILER CONSTRUCTION, INC. SC-2018-421: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES FOR NED DETWILER CONSTRUCTION, INC. SC-2018-421: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND FOR NED DETWILER CONSTRUCTION, INC. SC-2018-421: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS FOR NED DETWILER CONSTRUCTION, INC. SC-2018-421: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND FOR NED DETWILER CONSTRUCTION, INC. SC-2018-421: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND FOR NED DETWILER CONSTRUCTION, INC. SC-2018-421: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE FOR NED DETWILER CONSTRUCTION, INC.; Party: Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: POST-JUDGMENT GENERAL GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON BANCFIRST / GENERAL GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/AFFIDAVIT / NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT AND EXEMPTIONS / CLAIM FOR EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING; Party: Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Party: Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Party: Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Party: Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Party: Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Party: Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Party: Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Party: Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: CCADMINCSF; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketCode: SCINDEBT2; Description: INDEBTEDNESS >$5000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT / ORDER ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON GIBBS CONSTRUCTION INC; Count: 1; Party: Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS >$5000.00.(SCINDEBT2); Filed By: Ned Detwiler Construction, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less