This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 02/12/2022 at 03:53:00 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage Llc VS Doe, Jane Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 Nationstar Mortgage Llc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Doe, Jane. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DeBerry, Michael D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8-34

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DeBerry, Michael D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage Llc

Defendants

Doe, Jane

Doe, John

Moreland, Rhonda

Rhonda Moreland, Personal Rep Of The Estates Of Robert And Barbara Gormley, Deceased

United States Of America, Ex Rel Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAER & TIMBERLAKE

Attorney at BAER & TIMBERLAKE

Po Box 18486

Oklahoma City, OK 73154

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/13/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON DE NOVO

07/17/2020: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON DE NOVO

NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/07/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

05/24/2018: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEJ; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON DE NOVO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: OTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX.REL OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2019-80149 ON 05/21/2019. PAYOR: BEAR & TIMBERLAKE TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 76.64. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2018-34: $43.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2018-34: $6.25 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2018-34: $1.94 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2018-34: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2018-34: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketCode: AC65; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketCode: AC59; Description: COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: Nationstar Mortgage Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less