This case was last updated from Okmulgee County Courts on 05/17/2022 at 09:26:08 (UTC).

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT V. CARMEN TAYLOR, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARMEN TAYLOR. This case was filed in Okmulgee County Courts, Okmulgee County Courthouse - Okmulgee Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMIREZ, PANDEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0016

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Okmulgee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

RAMIREZ, PANDEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT

Defendants

TAYLOR, CARMEN

NICKLE, PHYLLIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

NIXON, WILLIAM L

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PHYLLIS NICKLE

02/05/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO PHYLLIS NICKLE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CARMEN TAYLOR

02/05/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CARMEN TAYLOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE: RAMIREZ SET 6-24-22 @ 10 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR EARING: RAMIREZ: 4-21-22 @10A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE:RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM AND BRIEF IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RET'D FILED SERVED CARMEN TAYLOR 3-25-21 BY PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less