This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 04/13/2022 at 13:15:02 (UTC).

N.A. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) V. KIMBERLY ANN COX

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 N A CAPITAL ONE BANK USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIMBERLY ANN COX. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0084

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

COX, KIMBERLY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROGERS, JOSEPH H.

Po Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

JORDAN, RYAN

P.O. Box 21690

Oklahoma City, OK 73156

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS (RETURNED) NOT SERVING: KIMBERLY COX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT UNDER THE SOLDIER'S AND SAILOR'S CIVIL RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVING: KIMBERLY COX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS (ISSUED) AS FOLLOWS: BACK TO ATTORNEY; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less