This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 04/21/2022 at 01:56:00 (UTC).

Mortgage Clearing Corporation, Plaintiff, vs. Samuel Vadder; Lysse Vadder Occupants of the Premises, 1412 W Oklahoma Ave, Enid, OK 73703 Defendants.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Mortgage Clearing Corporation, Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Samuel Vadder Lysse Vadder Occupants of the Premises, 1412 W Oklahoma Ave, Enid, OK 73703 Defendants. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodward, Paul K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-15

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Woodward, Paul K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mortgage Clearing Company

Defendants

Lecrone, Lysse Dawn

Vadder, Samuel Henry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIVINGSTON, REX

Po Box 111

Braggs, OK 74423

 

Court Documents

PETITION

01/20/2022: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

01/20/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS

03/25/2022: ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: OCCUPANTS OF PREMISES NOT FOUND

03/25/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: OCCUPANTS OF PREMISES NOT FOUND

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: LYSSE VADDER THROUGH SAMUEL VADDER 2/26/22

03/25/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: LYSSE VADDER THROUGH SAMUEL VADDER 2/26/22

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: SAMUEL VADDER PERSONALLY 2/26/22

03/25/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: SAMUEL VADDER PERSONALLY 2/26/22

MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

03/25/2022: MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: STATUS; Docket: Paul K Woodward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR STAY; Docket: Paul K Woodward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: SAMUEL VADDER PERSONALLY 2/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: LYSSE VADDER THROUGH SAMUEL VADDER 2/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMU; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: OCCUPANTS OF PREMISES NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE WOODWARD: BENCH DKT: PLTF/LIVINGSTON; CASE STAYED; STATUS 09-13-22, 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-510801 ON 01/20/2022. PAYOR: REX LIVINGSTON TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 272.14. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2022-15: $193.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2022-15: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CJ-2022-15: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-15: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2022-15: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-15: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CJ-2022-15: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2022-15: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-15: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-15: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CJ-2022-15: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CJ-2022-15: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE WOODWARD, PAUL K TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: Mortgage Clearing Company

    Read MoreRead Less