This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 19:21:33 (UTC).

MONNIE L. WILLIAMSON V. REBECCA WOOD

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 MONNIE L WILLIAMSON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REBECCA WOOD. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Seminole County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDERSON, HONORABLE CHRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0144

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

ANDERSON, HONORABLE CHRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMSON, MONNIE L.

Defendant

WOOD, REBECCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BARNES, S. STEPHEN

204 E. 2Nd Street, P.O. Box 1534

Wewoka, OK 74884

BUTNER LAW FIRM

Attorney at BUTNER LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

ISSUED SUMMONS FOR REBECCA WOOD

08/19/2021: ISSUED SUMMONS FOR REBECCA WOOD

SUMMONS FOR REBECCA WOOD RETURNED/SERVED

08/20/2021: SUMMONS FOR REBECCA WOOD RETURNED/SERVED

PROOF OF SERVICE

08/20/2021: PROOF OF SERVICE

COURT MINUTE-CONTEMPT CITATION

11/02/2021: COURT MINUTE-CONTEMPT CITATION

PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE BOND

11/02/2021: PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE BOND

COURT MINUTE: ANDERSON

12/07/2021: COURT MINUTE: ANDERSON

WAIVER OF RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL ORDER ACCEPTING WAIVER OF

12/07/2021: WAIVER OF RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL ORDER ACCEPTING WAIVER OF

COURT MINUTE: ANDERSON

04/04/2022: COURT MINUTE: ANDERSON

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE: ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE: ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING - ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER RE-SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR CONTEMPT CITATION; Amount: $ 33.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER/JUDGMENT: ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS FOR REBECCA WOOD RETURNED/SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUED SUMMONS FOR REBECCA WOOD; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less