This case was last updated from Kiowa County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 18:25:27 (UTC).

MISC RECEIPTS

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 MISC RECEIPTS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Kiowa County Courts, Kiowa County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0012

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kiowa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Defendant

MISC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PHOTOS; Amount: $ 30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 4.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PASSPORT PHOTO; Amount: $ 15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 2.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPY; Amount: $ 1.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 4.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less