This case was last updated from Choctaw County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 10:07:59 (UTC).

MISC RECEIPTS

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 MISC RECEIPTS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Choctaw County Courts, Choctaw County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0011

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Choctaw, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Defendant

NOVEMBER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 7.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED COPY; Amount: $ 1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED COPY; Amount: $ 1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ML COPY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED COPY; Amount: $ 1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPY OF PROBATE; Amount: $ 39.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPY ML; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less