This case was last updated from Grady County Courts on 04/16/2022 at 21:28:34 (UTC).

MISC RECEIPTS

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 MISC RECEIPTS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Grady County Courts, Grady County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0010

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Grady, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Defendant

MISCELLANEOUS RECEIPT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED COPY OF MARRIAGE LICENSE; Amount: $ 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EXEMPLIFIED COPY OF PROBATE; Amount: $ 32.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED COPIES; Amount: $ 3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES OF CF-02-409; Amount: $ 15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPY OF MARRIAGE LICENSE; Amount: $ 1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES - CS-19-590; Amount: $ 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.27

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES OUT OF PB-20-220; Amount: $ 8.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AUTHENICATED COPY; Amount: $ 13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN P-17-158; Amount: $ 19.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES FOR JAMES LAWLER; Amount: $ 3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 23.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIED COPY OF MARRIAGE LICENSE; Amount: $ 1.50

    Read MoreRead Less