This case was last updated from Wagoner County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 06:15:43 (UTC).

MISC RECEIPTS

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 MISC RECEIPTS was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Wagoner County Courts, Wagoner County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0008

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Wagoner, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Defendant

MISCELLANEOUS RECEIPT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 273.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 1.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 40.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERT COPIES; Amount: $ 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 0.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -0.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 13.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 1.28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COPIES; Amount: $ 51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NON-COMPUTER CASE AMOUNT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less