This case was last updated from Comanche County Courts on 03/13/2023 at 14:19:30 (UTC).

Mildred Anderson, Plaintiff, v. Comanche Nephrology, PC., Defendant, and Balli Sodam, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 Mildred Anderson, Plaintiff, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Comanche Nephrology, PC , Defendant, and Balli Sodam, Defendant. This case was filed in Comanche County Courts, Comanche County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Tayloe, Emmit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-355

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Comanche, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Tayloe, Emmit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anderson, Mildred

Defendants

Comanche Nephrology Pc

Sodam, Balli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lloyd, James R II

Attorney at LLOYD & LLOYD

200 North Roosevelt Ave, Post Office Box 607

Sand Springs, OK 74063

Carr, Michael Eugene

1350 Sw 89Th St.

Okc, OK 73159

Defendant Attorney

Wiggins, John

3100 Okla Tower, 210 Park Ave.

Okla City, OK 73102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Docket: Emmit Tayloe

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCode: CER; Description: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCode: SO; Description: AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER / JUDGE TAYLOE PTC SET 5-11-23 @ 2:00PM TRIAL DATE TBD @ PTC; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO WITHDRAW; Docket: Emmit Tayloe

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • HearingEvent: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Docket: Emmit Tayloe

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW / JUDGE TAYLOE RE: JULIEANN M. ROBISON WITHDRAWS; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO WITHDRAW SET 12-15-22 @ 10:00AM; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketCode: RECP; Description: RECEIPT OF SCHEDULING DOCKET / #9594; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCode: RECP; Description: RECEIPT OF SCHEDULING DOCKET / #14344; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / JAMES R. LLOYD, II FOR PLAIN ; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCode: NEGL; Description: NEGLIGENCE (GENERAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: NEGLIGENCE (GENERAL)(NEGL); Filed By: Anderson, Mildred; Disposed: Pending.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less