This case was last updated from Delaware County Courts on 07/13/2021 at 05:55:29 (UTC).

MIDWESTERN LOANS, INC./COLCORD V. JOY JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 07/12/2018 MIDWESTERN LOANS, INC /COLCORD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOY JOSEPH. This case was filed in Delaware County Courts, Delaware County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is LITTLEFIELD, ALICIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0548

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Delaware, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

LITTLEFIELD, ALICIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDWESTERN LOANS, INC./COLCORD

Defendant

JOSEPH, JOY

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS

07/12/2018: FILE AND ENTER AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

07/12/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

ORDER AND RETURN - SERVED ADULT SISTER YOULMETA ON

08/01/2018: ORDER AND RETURN - SERVED ADULT SISTER YOULMETA ON

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketDescription: MAILED COPY TO PLAIN AND DEFENDANT; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • DocketDescription: JE JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE PLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: DEFENDANT FAILS TO APPEAR; COURT GRANTS DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET; PLAIN PRESENT IN PERSON BY MELIDA RIVERA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: CM: MATTER COMES BEFORE THE COURT ON THE SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketDescription: 7/19/18 BY JEFF LELAND - FEE $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER AND RETURN - SERVED ADULT SISTER YOULMETA ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: ISSUING ORDER TO PLAIN FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FILE AND ENTER AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less