This case was last updated from Murray County Courts on 09/30/2022 at 11:26:20 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V. RANDY HOLLAND

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RANDY HOLLAND. This case was filed in Murray County Courts, Murray County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DUCK, AARON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0077

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Murray, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DUCK, AARON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HOLLAND, RANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MUELLER, DAVID

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

FILE & ENTER PETITION

08/06/2018: FILE & ENTER PETITION

SUMMONS (RETURNED) SERVING: RANDY HOLLAND

08/31/2018: SUMMONS (RETURNED) SERVING: RANDY HOLLAND

ANSWER

09/05/2018: ANSWER

SCHEDULING ORDER

09/10/2018: SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

09/10/2018: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/19/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

12/20/2018: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SCHEDULING ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS (RETURNED) SERVING: RANDY HOLLAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVING: RANDY HOLLAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS (ISSUED) AS FOLLOWS: BACK TO ATTORNEY; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less