This case was last updated from Stephens County Courts on 04/09/2022 at 15:42:35 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V. MALINDA LARA

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MALINDA LARA. This case was filed in Stephens County Courts, Stephens County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is RUSSELL, G. BRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********243R

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Stephens, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

RUSSELL, G. BRENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LARA, MALINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LOVE, BEAL & NIXON,P.C.

Attorney at LOVE, BEAL & NIXON,P.C.

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EMPLOYER'S ANSWER RET TERMED 1-31-20 SIGNED TRAYCEE FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 02/03/2020. LG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EMPLOYER'S ANSWER RET W/ HOLDING 25% SIGNED TRAYCEE FOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND - EFFECTIVE 1/1/05; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENT PETITION EH W/CS; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less