This case was last updated from Creek County Courts on 05/28/2022 at 05:22:39 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V. JEREMY NOE

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JEREMY NOE. This case was filed in Creek County Courts, Creek County Courthouse - Sapulpa Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PARISH, LAWRENCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0467

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Creek, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PARISH, LAWRENCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

NOE, JEREMY

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER PETITION

08/10/2018: FILE AND ENTER PETITION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO JEREMY NOE 9-8-18 - PSS

09/14/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO JEREMY NOE 9-8-18 - PSS

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/10/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO JEREMY NOE 9-8-18 - PSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEREMY NOE-PSS RETURN TO ATTY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL INTERPRETER TRANSLATOR; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less