This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 04/03/2022 at 07:27:37 (UTC).

Midland Funding Llc, Plaintiff, v. Terry Dewitt, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 Midland Funding Llc, Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Terry Dewitt, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DeBerry, Michael D.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8-51

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DeBerry, Michael D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding Llc

Defendant

Dewitt, Terry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVE, BEAL & NIXON

Attorney at LOVE, BEAL & NIXON

P.O. Box 32738

Okc, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

08/13/2018: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

11/15/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

SUMMONS FEE

08/13/2018: SUMMONS FEE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/31/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

10/15/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/09/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

RELEASE & SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

05/28/2019: RELEASE & SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RSJ; Description: RELEASE & SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: JUDGEMENT ENTERED;; Party Details; Defendant: Dewitt, Terry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JE; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-76361 ON 08/13/2018. PAYOR: LOVE, BEAL & NIXON TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 229.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-51: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-51: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2018-51: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-51: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-51: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-51: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2018-51: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-51: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-51: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-51: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2018-51: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE DEBERRY, MICHAEL D. TO THIS CASE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: LTF; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Midland Funding Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less