This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 09/04/2021 at 05:54:28 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC, Plaintiff, v. Mark Wells, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 Midland Funding LLC, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mark Wells, Defendant. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Condren, Sheila A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-635

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Condren, Sheila A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Wells, Mark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mueller, David

Attorney at Love Beal & Nixon

P.O. Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS

08/10/2018: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

07/10/2019: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/24/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT)

09/05/2019: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS (POST JUDGMENT)

BANK OR FINANCIAL INSTITUTION'S ANSWER

09/18/2019: BANK OR FINANCIAL INSTITUTION'S ANSWER

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

08/19/2020: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

02/26/2021: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AFFIDAVIT

03/04/2021: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE'S ANSWER AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - RELEASE AND SATISFIED;; Party Details; Defendant: Wells, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: REL; Description: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-623361 ON 08/19/2020. PAYOR: EZ MESSENGER TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-635: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-635: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-635: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-635: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-635: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-635: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-635: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-635: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Midland Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUELLER, DAVID