This case was last updated from Pushmataha County Courts on 02/17/2023 at 13:08:29 (UTC).

Midland Credit Managment, Plaintiff, v. Larry J Speer, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 Midland Credit Managment, Plaintiff, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Larry J Speer, Defendant. This case was filed in Pushmataha County Courts, Pushmataha County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is DeBerry, Michael D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-13

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pushmataha, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

DeBerry, Michael D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Managment

Defendant

Speer, Larry J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOLEY, NEIL

Attorney at LOVE BEAL AND NIXON

P O Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

PLAN S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/06/2021: PLAN S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

04/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

ANSWER

11/22/2021: ANSWER

ANSWER

04/15/2021: ANSWER

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

08/18/2021: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

ORDER OVERRULING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

12/20/2021: ORDER OVERRULING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DWOP; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER OVERRULING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: Motion Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: Motion Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: COMES ON TODAY FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. PLAN COUNSEL PRESENT. RESPONDENT PRESENT PRO-SE. COURT HOLDS MATTERS UNDER ADVISEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAN S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: Motion Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: Motion Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: Midland Credit Managment; Disposed: Pending.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less