This case was last updated from Sequoyah County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 06:35:17 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT V. TARA D. ERHART

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against TARA D ERHART. This case was filed in Sequoyah County Courts, Sequoyah County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is ORENDORFF, MATTHEW. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0186

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Sequoyah, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

ORENDORFF, MATTHEW

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT

Defendant

ERHART, TARA D.

Gans, OK 74936

 

Court Documents

PETITION FILED (CIVIL $10,000.OO OR LESS)

08/06/2021: PETITION FILED (CIVIL $10,000.OO OR LESS)

SUMMONS ISSUED BK TO ATTY

08/06/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BK TO ATTY

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

09/15/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED BK TO ATTY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGHTY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FILED (CIVIL $10,000.OO OR LESS); Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less