This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 02/08/2023 at 05:36:55 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT V. PAUL KEEL

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against PAUL KEEL. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0066

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT

Defendant

KEEL, PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COOLEY, NEIL

P.O Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

01/24/2020: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

FILE AFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

02/24/2020: FILE AFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE - SERVED 2-9-2020

02/18/2020: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE - SERVED 2-9-2020

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

05/20/2020: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING- PAUL KEEL

06/16/2020: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING- PAUL KEEL

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -DFAS-DGG/CL

07/14/2020: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT -DFAS-DGG/CL

FILE RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND

01/24/2022: FILE RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE AND SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.); Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less