This case was last updated from Beckham County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 03:01:56 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT V. MELISSA A FLOWERS

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MELISSA A FLOWERS. This case was filed in Beckham County Courts, Beckham County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WEEDON, HONORABLE JILL C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0099

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Beckham, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WEEDON, HONORABLE JILL C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT

Defendant

FLOWERS, MELISSA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

NIXON, MR. WILLIAM LOWELL JR.

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

P.O. Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

GANI, MS. JENIFER A

Attorney at LOVE, BEAL & NIXON

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

HOMJAK, MRS. HARLEY L

Attorney at LOVE, BEAL & NIXON

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

MUELLER, MR. DAVID

Attorney at LOVE, BEAL & NIXON, P.C.

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSAL DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingEvent: CIV TRACKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CASE DISMISSED DUE TO NON-SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: JCW/DM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2022
  • HearingEvent: CIV TRACKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE RETURNED NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE:; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUELLER, DAVID