This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 04/06/2022 at 04:46:26 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT V. BRETT WOOD

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BRETT WOOD. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0337

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT

Defendant

WOOD, BRETT

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

07/01/2021: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

02/17/2022: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE- BRETT, SERVED 10-9-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS BRETT WOOD; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK RECOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.); Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less