This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 04/28/2022 at 20:07:58 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC V. MELINDA BENDER

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MELINDA BENDER. This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0051

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendant

BENDER, MELINDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JDGMNT. FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OFJJUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFUALT JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PDLTF; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHSC FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION CIVIL 10,000 OR LESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less