This case was last updated from Kingfisher County Courts on 04/11/2022 at 22:54:01 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC V. JOHN A CLAYTON

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN A CLAYTON. This case was filed in Kingfisher County Courts, Kingfisher County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHNEITER, LANCE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0060

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kingfisher, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SCHNEITER, LANCE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

CLAYTON, JOHN A

Kingfisher, OK 73750-4001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HORINEK, PEGGY S

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

ISSUING SUMMONS - TO ATTY

08/11/2021: ISSUING SUMMONS - TO ATTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED (CJ,FD,SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOHN A CLAYTON - 8-28-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - (SUMMONS) - RESIDENCE SERVICE -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER - JOHN A CLAYTON - PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUING SUMMONS - TO ATTY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7/1/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION - CIVIL (CS UNDER 10,000); Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less