This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 06:48:04 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. Plaintiff, vs. CHARLES HICKENBOTTOM, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARLES HICKENBOTTOM, Defendant. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Seigars, Jason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-251

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Seigars, Jason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HICKENBOTTOM, CHARLES R

Enid, OK 73701-3546

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOMJAK, HARLEY L

Attorney at LOVE, BEAL & NIXON PC

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

HORINEK, PEGGY S

Attorney at LOVE BEAL & NIXON, PC

P O Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

COOLEY, NEIL

Attorney at LOVE BEAL AND NIXON

P O Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

MUELLER, DAVID

Attorney at LOVE BEAL & NIXON PC

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

NIXON, WILLIAM L

Attorney at LOVE,BEAL & NIXON

P O Box 32738

Okla City, OK 73123

GANI, JENIFER A

Attorney at LOVE BEAL & NIXON PC

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS

08/02/2021: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS

SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

08/02/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: CHARLES HICKENBOTTOM PERSONALLY 9/17/21

10/01/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: CHARLES HICKENBOTTOM PERSONALLY 9/17/21

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

10/04/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

10/29/2021: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2023
  • HearingEvent: PURGE DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: HICKENBOTTOM, CHARLES R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: HICKENBOTTOM, CHARLES R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ANMS; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: CHARLES HICKENBOTTOM PERSONALLY 9/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-499935 ON 08/02/2021. PAYOR: LOVE BEAL & NIXON TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 239.14. LINE ITEMS: CS-2021-251: $160.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2021-251: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CS-2021-251: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-251: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2021-251: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-251: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CS-2021-251: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2021-251: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-251: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2021-251: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. CS-2021-251: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CS-2021-251: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE SEIGARS, JASON TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SMIP; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: SMF; Description: SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUELLER, DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOLEY, NEIL