This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 04/28/2022 at 17:42:41 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC, Plaintiff, v. JAMES O MAYHUGH, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMES O MAYHUGH, Defendant. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Seigars, Jason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-471

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Seigars, Jason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

Defendant

MAYHUGH, JAMES O JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOLEY, NEIL

Attorney at LOVE BEAL & NIXON PC

P.O.Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

PETITION

12/30/2020: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

12/30/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JAMES MAYHUGH THROUGH WIFE MELISSA 1/7/21

01/21/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: JAMES MAYHUGH THROUGH WIFE MELISSA 1/7/21

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/31/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

04/08/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/30/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

06/04/2021: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT W/SUMMONS - CONTINUING WAGE

GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

06/04/2021: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LOCKE SUPPLY NOT EMPLOYED

06/25/2021: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LOCKE SUPPLY NOT EMPLOYED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS - ANSWER FILED 6/25/21

07/02/2021: ORIGINAL SUMMONS - ANSWER FILED 6/25/21

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: ORIGINAL SUMMONS - ANSWER FILED 6/25/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ATG; Description: ANSWER TO GARNISHMENT BY LOCKE SUPPLY NOT EMPLOYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-496112 ON 06/04/2021. PAYOR: EZ MESSENGER TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 116.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2020-471: $73.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2020-471: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-471: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2020-471: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-471: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2020-471: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-471: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2020-471: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GSIMA; Description: GARNISHMENT SUMMONS ISSUED MAILED BY PLAIN OR ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN0155; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTION; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOLEY, NEIL