This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 01/17/2023 at 05:04:52 (UTC).

Midfirst Bank VS Garrard, Catherine L Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Midfirst Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Garrard, Catherine L. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Condren, Sheila A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0-31

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Condren, Sheila A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midfirst Bank

Defendants

Garrard, Catherine L

Garrard, Robert L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jenkins, Kim S

Attorney at Baer & Timberlake PC

P.O. Box 18486, Kjenkins@Baer-Timberlake.Com

Oklahoma City,, OK 73154

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

08/14/2020: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/04/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY GINA KNIGHT PRESENT FOR PLTF. CASE COMES ON FOR PLTF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. MOTION GRANTED. ORDER SIGNED.

10/07/2020: JUDGE CONDREN: ATTY GINA KNIGHT PRESENT FOR PLTF. CASE COMES ON FOR PLTF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. MOTION GRANTED. ORDER SIGNED.

BILL OF APPRAISERS (GAYLE COPPINGER $150, KATHY PERRY $150 & JOAN ROBERTS $150)

10/21/2020: BILL OF APPRAISERS (GAYLE COPPINGER $150, KATHY PERRY $150 & JOAN ROBERTS $150)

PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

08/17/2020: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ALIAS NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

06/25/2020: ALIAS NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE

10/20/2020: SPECIAL EXECUTION AND ORDER OF SALE

NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

06/05/2020: NOTICE BY PUBLICATION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/23/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SOLD TO PLTF)(COPY)

03/01/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SOLD TO PLTF)(COPY)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/19/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

01/15/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

JUDGE CONDREN: DEF FAILS TO APPEAR. CASE COMES ON FOR MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE. SALE CONFIRMED. ORDER SUBMITTED AND SIGNED.

01/06/2021: JUDGE CONDREN: DEF FAILS TO APPEAR. CASE COMES ON FOR MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE. SALE CONFIRMED. ORDER SUBMITTED AND SIGNED.

ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

01/06/2021: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF MAILING

12/14/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF MAILING

NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

12/03/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

ORDER FOR HEARING

12/03/2020: ORDER FOR HEARING

MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

12/03/2020: MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2021-643530 ON 06/09/2021. PAYOR: TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 0.00. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2020-31: $10.00 ON TRANSFER TO AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE. CJ-2020-31: $-10.00 ON TRANSFER FROM AC99 HOLDING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SSR; Description: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SOLD TO PLTF)(COPY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CERTS; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE; Docket: Sheila A. Condren

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE CONDREN: DEF FAILS TO APPEAR. CASE COMES ON FOR MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFF'S SALE. SALE CONFIRMED. ORDER SUBMITTED AND SIGNED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OSALE; Description: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: FORE; Description: FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORECLOSURE(FORE); Filed By: Midfirst Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less