This case was last updated from Craig County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 15:27:27 (UTC).

MICHIYO LAPPE V. SHANE MATTHEW KITT

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 MICHIYO LAPPE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHANE MATTHEW KITT. This case was filed in Craig County Courts, Craig County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CROSSON, HONORABLE TERRELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0082

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Craig, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CROSSON, HONORABLE TERRELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAPPE, MICHIYO

Defendant

KITT, SHANE MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CM: CLERKS OFFICE CONTACTED DEFENDANT SHANE KITT BY

08/26/2021: CM: CLERKS OFFICE CONTACTED DEFENDANT SHANE KITT BY

CM: NO CR JUDGE CROSSON PRESIDING. PLAN PRESENT

09/10/2021: CM: NO CR JUDGE CROSSON PRESIDING. PLAN PRESENT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

09/10/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2026
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: POSS AND COST GRANTED IN 48 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND SWORN. DEF PRESENT AND SWORN. TESTIMONIES HEARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: NO CR; JUDGE CROSSON PRESIDING. PLAN PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEARING TO 9/10/2021 AT 9AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PHONE AND ADVISED HIM OF THE CONTINUANCE OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CASE IS BEING CONTINUED TO 9/10/2021 AT 9AM ON THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: NO CR; PER JUDGE CROSSON. AT PLAIN 'S REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN OF SERVICE. 8-19-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CARES ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 4024 OF THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS ISSUED SHERIFF CRAIG; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT & ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less