This case was last updated from Logan County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 05:46:46 (UTC).

Michelle R Gray v. Dalante Shannon

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 Michelle R Gray filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dalante Shannon. This case was filed in Logan County Courts, Logan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Duel, Louis A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-74

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Logan, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Duel, Louis A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gray, Michelle Renee

Defendant

Shannon, Dalante

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carson, Joe

Warhawk Legal, Renaissance Centre East 127 Nw 10Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

 

Court Documents

PETITION

06/07/2021: PETITION

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (JOE CARSON)

06/07/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (JOE CARSON)

SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON DALANTE SHANNON

06/07/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE ON DALANTE SHANNON

SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME INWHICH TO FURTHER ANSWER OR PLEAD

07/01/2021: SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME INWHICH TO FURTHER ANSWER OR PLEAD

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

07/01/2021: REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

ORDER SETTING CASE FOR STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

07/12/2021: ORDER SETTING CASE FOR STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

ANSWER

07/16/2021: ANSWER

SCHEDULING ORDER

08/18/2021: SCHEDULING ORDER

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

01/27/2022: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Shannon, Dalante

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Party: Gray, Michelle Renee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Party: Gray,MichelleRenee; Docket: Louis A Duel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE DUEL- COURT IS ADVISED CASE HAS SETTLED. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS STRICKEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SO; Description: SCHEDULING ORDER; Party: Gray, Michelle Renee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFENDANT'S STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Party: Shannon,Dalante; Docket: Louis A Duel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE DUEL- CASE COMES BEFORE THE COURT FOR STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. PARTIES APPEAR BY COUNSEL. COURT ORDERS DECEMBER 1, 2022 AS THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE DATE. CASE IS SET FOR PRETRIAL ON JANUARY 7, 2022 AT 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER; Party: Shannon, Dalante

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER SETTING CASE FOR STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Party: Shannon, Dalante

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: REQ; Description: REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Party: Shannon, Dalante

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCode: AUTONEG; Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Count: 1; Party: Gray, Michelle Renee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: AUTO NEGLIGENCE(AUTONEG); Filed By: Gray, Michelle Renee

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARSON, JOE