This case was last updated from Texas County Courts on 04/17/2022 at 00:57:57 (UTC).

MERIT ENERGY COMPANY LLC V. ATLAS OBO ENERGY LP

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 MERIT ENERGY COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ATLAS OBO ENERGY LP. This case was filed in Texas County Courts, Texas County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PARSLEY, JON K.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0040

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Texas, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PARSLEY, JON K.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERIT ENERGY COMPANY LLC

Defendant

ATLAS OBO ENERGY LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HIRSCH, KARL F

Attorney at HIRSCH & HEATH, PLLC

901 Cedar Lake Boulevard

Oklahoma City, OK 73114

FOSTER, ZACHARY J.

Attorney at MAHAFFEY & GORE, P.C.

300 N.E. 1St Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73104

 

Court Documents

PETITION

10/04/2021: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE:

10/04/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE:

PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER

01/31/2022: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • HearingEvent: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: /S/JKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AN AGREED SCHED ORDER BY THE PARTIES IS FORTHCOMING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: MINUTE/ORDER 2-23-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less