This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 04/26/2022 at 13:19:59 (UTC).

MERCHANTS ACCEPTANCE CORP, Plaintiff, v. SHARLET BUCHANAN, Defendant, and RICHARD ANSCHUETZ, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 MERCHANTS ACCEPTANCE CORP, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHARLET BUCHANAN, Defendant, and RICHARD ANSCHUETZ, Defendant. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6031

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCHANTS ACCEPTANCE CORP

Defendants

ANSCHUETZ, RICHARD

BUCHANAN, SHARLET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOESE, KALEB

Raush, Sturm, Israel, 5200 S Yale Ave Suite 505

Tulsa, OK 74135

 

Court Documents

PETITION

08/06/2018: PETITION

PARTY HAS NOT BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. SUMMONS / NON SERVED / ON 9-10-18 / BY PS

09/14/2018: PARTY HAS NOT BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. SUMMONS / NON SERVED / ON 9-10-18 / BY PS

PARTY HAS NOT BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. SUMMONS / NON SERVED / FOR RICHARD ANSCHUETZ / ON 9-26-18 / BY PS

10/02/2018: PARTY HAS NOT BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. SUMMONS / NON SERVED / FOR RICHARD ANSCHUETZ / ON 9-26-18 / BY PS

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE / AS TO SHARLET BUCHANAN AND RICHARD ANSCHUETZ

06/05/2019: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE / AS TO SHARLET BUCHANAN AND RICHARD ANSCHUETZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: BUCHANAN, SHARLET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: ANSCHUETZ, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketCode: DISPDWOP; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: BUCHANAN, SHARLET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketCode: DISPDWOP; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: ANSCHUETZ, RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DWOP; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE / AS TO SHARLET BUCHANAN AND RICHARD ANSCHUETZ; Party: BUCHANAN, SHARLET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: U; Description: PARTY HAS NOT BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. SUMMONS / NON SERVED / FOR RICHARD ANSCHUETZ / ON 9-26-18 / BY PS; Party: BUCHANAN, SHARLET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: U; Description: PARTY HAS NOT BEEN SUCCESSFULLY SERVED. SUMMONS / NON SERVED / ON 9-10-18 / BY PS; Party: BUCHANAN, SHARLET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT 77195

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2018-3816040 ON 08/24/2018. PAYOR: 1/T TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 10.00. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-6031: $9.75 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-6031: $0.25 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:CS-2018-6031: AC01 CLERK FEES -$0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: MERCHANTS ACCEPTANCE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOESE, KALEB