This case was last updated from Texas County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 04:23:33 (UTC).

MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF TX COUNTY V. TERRY LYNN MAGNER, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF TX COUNTY filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against TERRY LYNN MAGNER. This case was filed in Texas County Courts, Texas County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JETT, A. CLARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0013

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Texas, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JETT, A. CLARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF TX COUNTY

Defendants

MAGNER, TERRY LYNN

MAGNER, MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BREHM, AMBER M.

Po Box 4069

Wichita, KS 67204

 

Court Documents

ORDER SERVED (TERRY)

02/14/2022: ORDER SERVED (TERRY)

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (RE: CONTINUANCE)

03/09/2022: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (RE: CONTINUANCE)

CERTICIATE OF SERVICE OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

03/09/2022: CERTICIATE OF SERVICE OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COSTS OF $70.22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SEVERALLY, STAT INT AT 5.25% FROM TODAY AND COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STIPULATES. JUDGMENT FOR PLTF FOR $1,091.26, JOINTLY &

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: BOTH PARTIES APPEAR. SWORN TESTIMONY. DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL - DATED: 2/1/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SERVED (TERRY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ARTICLE #: 9171 9690 0935 0272 9661 00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SIGNED BY: COVID 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL - DATED: 2/1/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER SERVED (MARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER ISSUED TO PLAIN FOR SERVICE; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less