This case was last updated from McCurtain County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 15:40:25 (UTC).

MCCURTAIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL V. MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER WEST

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 MCCURTAIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER WEST. This case was filed in McCurtain County Courts, McCurtain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0518

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    McCurtain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCURTAIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Defendant

WEST, MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

COURT MINUTE

11/30/2021: COURT MINUTE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S DISMISSAL OF PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO FILE RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less