This case was last updated from McCurtain County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 13:35:52 (UTC).

MCCURTAIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL V. LINDA DANELL JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 MCCURTAIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LINDA DANELL JOHNSON. This case was filed in McCurtain County Courts, McCurtain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0235

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    McCurtain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCURTAIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Defendant

JOHNSON, LINDA DANELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT ANSWER:$187.38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS/ISSUE; Amount: $ 63.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO FILE RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less