This case was last updated from McCurtain County Courts on 06/23/2022 at 04:34:17 (UTC).

MCCURTAIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL V. KATIE L SMITH

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 MCCURTAIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KATIE L SMITH. This case was filed in McCurtain County Courts, McCurtain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BROCK, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0506

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    McCurtain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BROCK, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCURTAIN MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Defendant

SMITH, KATIE L

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ISSUE APPLICATION

02/04/2022: FILE AND ISSUE APPLICATION

ORDER TO APPEAR AND ANSWER AS TO ASSETS

02/04/2022: ORDER TO APPEAR AND ANSWER AS TO ASSETS

ALIAS ORDER TO APPEAR AND ANSWER AS TO ASSETS

05/23/2022: ALIAS ORDER TO APPEAR AND ANSWER AS TO ASSETS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS ORDER TO APPEAR AND ANSWER AS TO ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO FILE RETURN OF SERVICE-NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS ORDER TO APPEAR AND ANSWER AS TO ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STRICKEN, NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO FILE RETURN OF SERVICE-NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 1.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.01

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ISSUE APPLICATION; Amount: $ 33.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AGREED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less