This case was last updated from Pittsburg County Courts on 07/01/2022 at 21:39:41 (UTC).

MCALESTER MEDICAL SERVICES, LLC V. JACOB DANIELS

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 MCALESTER MEDICAL SERVICES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACOB DANIELS. This case was filed in Pittsburg County Courts, Pittsburg County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0218

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pittsburg, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCLAUGHLIN, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCALESTER REG HEALTH CARE AUTH

MCALESTER MEDICAL SERVICES, LLC

Defendant

DANIELS, JACOB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HACKLER, DEBORAH

P.O. Box 954

Mcalester,, OK 74502

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ON 5/4/22 BY PROCESS SERVER A BULLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT W/ORDER AND PROOF OF SERVICE RETURNED. SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE AFFIDAVIT OF CLAIM W/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HACKLER, DEBORAH