This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 01/11/2022 at 07:20:42 (UTC).

Matthew B Johnson, Plaintiff, v. Tonya Leigh Boland, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2018 Matthew B Johnson, Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tonya Leigh Boland, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Ogden, Richard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3264

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Ogden, Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnson, Matthew B

Defendant

Boland, Tonya Leigh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel, Danielle

Warhawk Legal127 N.W. 10Th St.

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

 

Court Documents

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-ATTORNEY FOR PLAIN

06/14/2018: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-ATTORNEY FOR PLAIN

PETITION

06/14/2018: PETITION

SUMMONS RETURNED/TONYA LEIGH BOLAND SVD IN PERSON 8-1-18

08/02/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED/TONYA LEIGH BOLAND SVD IN PERSON 8-1-18

DEFENDANT'S ASWER TO PLAIN 'S PETITION

11/19/2018: DEFENDANT'S ASWER TO PLAIN 'S PETITION

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

04/26/2019: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

MOTION TO ENTER

07/19/2019: MOTION TO ENTER

SCHEDULING ORDER / JUDGE OGDEN

08/06/2019: SCHEDULING ORDER / JUDGE OGDEN

DEFENDANT'S OFFER TO CONFESS JUDGMENT

12/06/2019: DEFENDANT'S OFFER TO CONFESS JUDGMENT

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

01/28/2020: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Docket: Richard Ogden

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE OGDEN: PTC-- STRICKEN CASE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Boland, Tonya Leigh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: Boland, Tonya Leigh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: DEFENDANT'S OFFER TO CONFESS JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO ENTER; Docket: Richard Ogden

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SCHO; Description: SCHEDULING ORDER / JUDGE OGDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE OGDEN: MTE-- HELD, PTC IS SET FOR 02-06-2020 AT 11AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO ENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NO; Description: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: AUTONEG; Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: AUTO NEGLIGENCE(AUTONEG); Filed By: Johnson, Matthew B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL, DANIELLE