This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 06/24/2023 at 05:37:50 (UTC).

MARY SUE BAXTER V. JADON TRENT BOSWELL

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 MARY SUE BAXTER filed an Other lawsuit against JADON TRENT BOSWELL. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MCDANIEL, TRACY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0017

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MCDANIEL, TRACY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAXTER, MARY SUE

Defendant

BOSWELL, JADON TRENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GRUBB, ALLAN

 

Court Documents

FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR

01/17/2023: FILE ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR

FILE RETURN OF SERVICE TO JADEN BOSWELL 1-18-23

01/23/2023: FILE RETURN OF SERVICE TO JADEN BOSWELL 1-18-23

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

01/23/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

FILE CM: CASE DISMISSED COST WAIVED

01/16/2023: FILE CM: CASE DISMISSED COST WAIVED

 

Docket Entries

01/27/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.66

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -2.48

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 85.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE CM: CASE DISMISSED COST WAIVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less