This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 05/25/2022 at 02:04:38 (UTC).

MARTY A COX, Plaintiff, v. STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 MARTY A COX, Plaintiff filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against STATE OF OKLAHOMA EX REL OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION, Defendant. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-122

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COX, MARTY A

Defendant

OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FRY, CHRISTOPHER G

Oklahoma Tax Commission, P O Box 269056

Okc, OK 73126

 

Court Documents

PETITION

01/21/2022: PETITION

ANSWER OF THE OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/09/2022: ANSWER OF THE OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / CHRISTOPHER G FRY ENTERING AS COUNSEL / W-CS / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/09/2022: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / CHRISTOPHER G FRY ENTERING AS COUNSEL / W-CS / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ORDER

02/18/2022: ORDER

ORDER

03/30/2022: ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-4340087 ON 04/01/2022. PAYOR: MARTY A COX TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 1.50. LINE ITEMS: CV-2022-122: $1.50 ON AC01 CLERK FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCode: COPY; Description: COPIES CHARGED; Amount: $ 1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: DRUMMOND,DOUG: ORDER ENTERED. (CLERK TO FILE ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: DRUMMOND, DOUG; ORDER ON PLAIN 'S APPLICATION ENTERED. ((CLERK WILL FILE ORDER))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / CHRISTOPHER G FRY ENTERING AS COUNSEL / W-CS / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Party: OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER OF THE OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION / CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Party: OKLAHOMA TAX COMMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-4312116 ON 01/21/2022. PAYOR: COX/MARTY TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 154.14. LINE ITEMS: CV-2022-122: $82.91 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CV-2022-122: $3.86 ON AC09 CARD ALLOCATIONS. CV-2022-122: $5.85 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. CV-2022-122: $1.61 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CV-2022-122: $4.87 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CV-2022-122: $1.51 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CV-2022-122: $6.82 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. CV-2022-122: $0.43 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CV-2022-122: $2.41 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CV-2022-122: $24.37 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CV-2022-122: $9.75 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. CV-2022-122: $9.75 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: ADJUSTING ENTRY: MONIES DUE TO THE FOLLOWING AGENCIES REDUCED BY THE FOLLOWING AMOUNTS:CV-2022-122: AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE -$0.25CV-2022-122: AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY -$0.25CV-2022-122: AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND -$0.63CV-2022-122: AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND -$0.07CV-2022-122: AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS -$0.02CV-2022-122: AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY -$0.18CV-2022-122: AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND -$0.04CV-2022-122: AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES -$0.13CV-2022-122: AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND -$0.05CV-2022-122: AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL -$0.15CV-2022-122: AC01 CLERK FEES -$2.09

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: DECLARE; Description: DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: DECLARATORY JUDGMENT(DECLARE); Filed By: COX, MARTY A

    Read MoreRead Less