This case was last updated from Marshall County Courts on 05/19/2022 at 10:28:38 (UTC).

MARSHALL COUNTY HMA LLC D/B/A V. KASEY LYNN MOORE

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 MARSHALL COUNTY HMA LLC D/B/A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KASEY LYNN MOORE. This case was filed in Marshall County Courts, Marshall County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, GREGORY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0119

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Marshall, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, GREGORY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARSHALL COUNTY HMA LLC D/B/A

Defendants

MOORE, KASEY

MOORE, KASEY LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WELLS, C. SCOTT

Attorney at THE DELONEY LAW GROUP

6440 N. Central Expy., Ste. 850

Dallas, TX 75206

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFIACTE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SERVICE MEMBERS CIVIL RELIEF ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED/KASEY MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED BTA FOR SERVICE ON KASEY MOORE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less