This case was last updated from Creek County Courts on 06/24/2022 at 01:43:30 (UTC).

MARIE MULLINS, ET. AL. V. ROBERT BEASLEY, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 MARIE MULLINS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBERT BEASLEY. This case was filed in Creek County Courts, Creek County Courthouse - Sapulpa Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SERNER, JASON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0227

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Creek, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SERNER, JASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FAIRVIEW APARTMENTS, LLC

MULLINS, MARIE

Defendants

BEASLEY, ROBERT

BEASLEY, KIMBERLY

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT FILED (UNDER $5000)

05/17/2022: AFFIDAVIT FILED (UNDER $5000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 6-21-22 @ 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM:JS:NO CSR: 5-31-22 - CONTINUED BY AGREEMENT TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 5-20-22 BY CCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED CREEK COUNTY SHERIFF; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT FILED (UNDER $5000); Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less