This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 01/05/2022 at 13:31:05 (UTC).

MARIE BETTINE V. GEORGE PIXLER

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 MARIE BETTINE filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against GEORGE PIXLER. This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDERSON, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0042

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HENDERSON, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETTINE, MARIE

Defendant

PIXLER, GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HAYS, DANIEL C.

1800 Cotter Ranch Tower100 N Broadway

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

WHITE, WILSON T.

4416 S. Harvard Ave

Tulsa, OK 74135

CHANSOLME HARROZ SCHNEBEL PLLC

Attorney at CHANSOLME HARROZ SCHNEBEL PLLC

1800 Cotter Ranch Tower100 N Broadway Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND RESERVATION OF TIME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMARY ORDER FILED (DISPO;STRICKEN FEB 2019 JT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISP. DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHSC FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PDLTF; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION FOR CIVIL 10,000 OR MORE; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less