This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 05/28/2023 at 10:24:00 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. TRACY SOUTH

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against TRACY SOUTH. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0024

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SOUTH, TRACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TRAVIS, MARGARET

LOVE BEAL & NIXON

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

01/13/2023: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- MARGARET TRAVIS

01/27/2023: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- MARGARET TRAVIS

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- TRACY, SERVED 1-20-23

01/24/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- TRACY, SERVED 1-20-23

FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/14/2023: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

FILE NOTICE OF HEARING- 5-4-23 AT 9:00AM

04/27/2023: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING- 5-4-23 AT 9:00AM

FILE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT

05/01/2023: FILE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT

FILE COURT MINUTE - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

05/04/2023: FILE COURT MINUTE - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2023
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STRICKEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE COURT MINUTE - MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING- 5-4-23 AT 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE- TRACY SOUTH; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- MARGARET TRAVIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- TRACY, SERVED 1-20-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.); Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less