This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 04/10/2022 at 15:40:05 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. ROBERT BUXTON

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERT BUXTON. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is LEVERETT, BRAD D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0118

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

LEVERETT, BRAD D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BUXTON, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

NIXON, WILLIAM L. JR.

Attorney at LOVE BEAL AND NIXON

Po Box 32738

Okalhoma City, OK 73123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITH CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED ROBERT BUXTON 9/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAIVT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (RETURNED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS - ROBERT BUXTON; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR INDEBTEDNESS; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less