This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 07/18/2023 at 16:32:34 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. MICHAEL ROY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against MICHAEL ROY. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0022

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ROY, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

01/12/2023: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

FILE RESPONSE TO ALLEGATIONS

02/01/2023: FILE RESPONSE TO ALLEGATIONS

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- MICHAEL, SERVED 1-20-23

01/24/2023: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- MICHAEL, SERVED 1-20-23

FILE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

02/08/2023: FILE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

FILE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

03/17/2023: FILE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

03/17/2023

HearingEvent: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE- MICHAEL ROY; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RESPONSE TO ALLEGATIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- MICHAEL, SERVED 1-20-23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS- MICHAEL ROY; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.); Amount: $ 150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less