This case was last updated from Stephens County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 12:38:21 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. ELIZABETH RAY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELIZABETH RAY. This case was filed in Stephens County Courts, Stephens County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HERBERGER, JERRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********074S

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Stephens, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HERBERGER, JERRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

RAY, ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE. VL

04/09/2021: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE. VL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: ST:DISMISSED - SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS (E. RAY) RET W/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE. VL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS (E. RAY) RET TO ATTY AB; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND - EFFECTIVE 1/1/05; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENT PETITION AB; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less