This case was last updated from Cherokee County Courts on 04/22/2022 at 21:06:02 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. DAVID ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVID ORTIZ. This case was filed in Cherokee County Courts, Cherokee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HUGGINS, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Cherokee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HUGGINS, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ORTIZ, DAVID

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

01/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISPO. DKT KIRKLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED DIRECT (D.ORTIZ); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less